NJ S1074 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2490
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Approved P.L.2019, c.81.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Approved P.L.2019, c.81.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for protection of public right of access to certain public trust lands.*
Title
Provides for protection of public right of access to certain public trust lands.*
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4221 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.81. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-7-2) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4221 (2R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-4) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2490 (Carry Over) 2017-01-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4221 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1074 (4R)
A4221 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1074 (4R)