NJ S1149 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1670

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for appointment of Student Loan Ombudsman and regulates student loan servicers.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for appointment of Student Loan Ombudsman and regulates student loan servicers.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A455 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
2019-06-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-4-4)
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted for A455 (1R)
2019-06-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (37-1)
2018-02-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A455 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S1149 (1R)
A1670 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-2)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback