NJ A455 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1670

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S1149 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for appointment of Student Loan Ombudsman and regulates student loan servicers.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for appointment of Student Loan Ombudsman and regulates student loan servicers.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted by S1149 (1R)
2019-06-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1670 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-2)
S1149 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.200.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback