NJ S1763 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4021
Note: Carry Over of previous A5425
Note: Carry Over of previous A5425
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A2280 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A2280 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes certain payments for referral of patients to substance use disorder treatment facilities.
Title
Criminalizes certain payments for referral of patients to substance use disorder treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A2280 (2R) |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2280 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.31.
S4021 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5425 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4021 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5425 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee