NJ S1771 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4576 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A4576 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires lowest possible price not exceeding certain cap for inmate telephone calls.*
Title
Requires lowest possible price not exceeding certain cap for inmate telephone calls.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A4576 (ACS/1R) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Turner) |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4576 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session