NJ S2045 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4772

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Working Group on Deaf Education; directs DOE to develop parent resource guide; requires DOE and DOH to collect and report certain data on elays in deaf and hard of hearing children from birth to age 5.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Working Group on Deaf Education; directs DOE to develop parent resource guide; requires DOE and DOH to collect and report certain data on elays in deaf and hard of hearing children from birth to age 5.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1893 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.205.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A1893 (2R)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (38-0) (Turner)
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1893 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2045 (4R)
A4772 (Carry Over) 2017-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback