NJ S2249 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5217
Note: Carry Over of previous S3447
Note: Carry Over of previous S3447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Juvenile Offender Community Conservation and Improvement Services Program.
Title
Establishes Juvenile Offender Community Conservation and Improvement Services Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1414 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A5217 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3447 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5217 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3447 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2249 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2249_I1.HTM |