NJ S2407 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A331
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Combined with S64/1515 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Combined with S64/1515 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows gross income tax credit for certain child and dependent care expenses.
Title
Allows gross income tax credit for certain child and dependent care expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Combined with S64/1515 (SCS) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2263 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A331 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A331 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee