NJ S2535 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Motion To Table (21-15) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Motion To Table (21-15) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases benefit amounts under New Jersey earned income tax credit program to 25 percent of federal earned income tax credit amounts beginning in Tax Year 2013.
Title
Increases benefit amounts under New Jersey earned income tax credit program to 25 percent of federal earned income tax credit amounts beginning in Tax Year 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3793 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3793 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-15) (Weinberg) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Motion To Make Order of the day (Kyrillos) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-24-5) |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A3793 |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-1) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Motion To Table (22-14) (Weinberg) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Pennacchio) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3793 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Substituted by S2535