NJ S2536 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S559
Note: Legislation replaced by A3480/4119
Note: Legislation replaced by A3480/4119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns employer inquires about worker's wage and salary experience.
Title
Concerns employer inquires about worker's wage and salary experience.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2536 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A3480/4119 (ACS)
A3480 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A3480/4119 (Replaced by) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A3480 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A3480/4119 (Replaced by) 2017-07-31 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly