NJ S2841 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1864
Note: Carry Foward to future A4460
Note: Carry Foward to future A4460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from six to 12 months compensation program for injured law enforcement officers and other employees.*
Title
Extends from six to 12 months compensation program for injured law enforcement officers and other employees.*
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2841 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2841 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4075 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2841 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4075 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee