NJ S3110 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.191.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.191.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain health clubs to offer swimming lessons and otherwise remain exempt from first aid personnel and lifeguarding requirements.*
Title
Permits certain health clubs to offer swimming lessons and otherwise remain exempt from first aid personnel and lifeguarding requirements.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4617 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.191. |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A4617 (1R) |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4617 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Substituted by S3110 (1R)