NJ S317 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contracting units and boards of education to credit contractors with interest earned on certain funds withheld from payment to contractors. *
Title
Requires contracting units and boards of education to credit contractors with interest earned on certain funds withheld from payment to contractors. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-11-21 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Senate (28-9) | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3990 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee