NJ S3202 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires hospitals to provide breast cancer patients with information concerning reconstructive surgery; prohibits certain provisions in managed care plan contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires hospitals to provide breast cancer patients with information concerning reconstructive surgery; prohibits certain provisions in managed care plan contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-14SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Lagana)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4738 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback