NJ S321 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4283
Note: Carry Over of previous A5988
Note: Carry Over of previous S141
Note: Carry Over of previous A2558
Note: Carry Over of previous A5988
Note: Carry Over of previous S141
Note: Carry Over of previous A2558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes expedited process by which certain out-of-State mental health professionals are licensed to provide services in New Jersey.
Title
Establishes expedited process by which certain out-of-State mental health professionals are licensed to provide services in New Jersey.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4283 (Carry Over) 2021-12-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5988 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S141 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2558 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5988 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S141 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2558 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S321 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/321_I1.HTM |