NJ S328 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1569
Note: Carry Foward to future S3520
Note: Carry Over of previous S4283
Note: Carry Over of previous A5703
Note: Carry Foward to future S3520
Note: Carry Over of previous S4283
Note: Carry Over of previous A5703
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public transportation employees to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking.
Title
Requires public transportation employees to complete training course on handling and responding to suspected human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S328 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S328 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4283 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2638 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A5703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S328 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S4283 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2638 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A5703 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S328 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/328_I1.HTM |