NJ S3301 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1961
Note: Carry Over of previous A5500
Note: Carry Over of previous A5500
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-26 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands duties of Commission on Human Trafficking to prevent human trafficking in women and children of color.
Title
Expands duties of Commission on Human Trafficking to prevent human trafficking in women and children of color.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3301 (Carry Over) 2023-06-26 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A1728 (Same As) 2023-06-26 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A5500 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1728 (Same As) 2023-06-26 - Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
A5500 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading