NJ S3306 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A4918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A4918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Secretary of State to designate one-stop event planning contact person for certain events held in NJ.
Title
Requires Secretary of State to designate one-stop event planning contact person for certain events held in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4918 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4918 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.198.