NJ S3474 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4882 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A4882 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain members or retirees of PFRS,SPRS, or PERS to receive accidental disability retirement allowance for disability resulting from participation in 9/11 World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.*
Title
Permits certain members or retirees of PFRS,SPRS, or PERS to receive accidental disability retirement allowance for disability resulting from participation in 9/11 World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.*
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4882 (3R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4882 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.157.