NJ S3905 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S786
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5851 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5851 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows veteran's guardian to remove veteran from DMVA veterans' memorial home under certain emergency circumstances.
Title
Allows veteran's guardian to remove veteran from DMVA veterans' memorial home under certain emergency circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5851 (1R) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3905 (Carry Over) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5851 (1R)
A5851 (Same As) 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.216.
A5851 (Same As) 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.216.