NJ S4340 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S487
Note: Carry Over of previous A3587
Note: Carry Over of previous A3587
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances PFRS accidental death pension for surviving spouse by providing for minimum of $50,000 annually.
Title
Enhances PFRS accidental death pension for surviving spouse by providing for minimum of $50,000 annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A491 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4340 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A491
A491 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3587 (Carry Over) 2016-05-20 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact
A491 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3587 (Carry Over) 2016-05-20 - Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to not enact