NJ S475 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain information regarding Down syndrome be provided to certain parents and families.
Title
Requires certain information regarding Down syndrome be provided to certain parents and families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3233 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.173. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A3233 (1R) |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2014-10-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3233 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S475 (1R)