NJ SJR72 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, JR10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, JR10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates second Monday of May each year as "New Jersey Economic Development Day."
Title
Designates second Monday of May each year as "New Jersey Economic Development Day."
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Edward Thomson [R] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR139 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR10. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR139 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR139 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by SJR72