NJ SJR73 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Urges U.S. Congress to pass "Military Hunger Prevention Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges U.S. Congress to pass "Military Hunger Prevention Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR132 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateApproved P.L.2019, JR-21.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-06-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted for AJR132 (1R)
2019-06-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR132 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SJR73 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback