NM SB190 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 61 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 61 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dev Disabilities Planning Council
Title
Dev Disabilities Planning Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 61 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:2 |
2021-03-15 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-14 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC |
2021-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2021-03-13 | Senate | multiple floor amendments |
2021-03-11 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-02-18 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |