NM SB365 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] HHouse Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] HHouse Health
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Define & Schedule Cannabidiol
Title
Define & Schedule Cannabidiol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] HHouse Health |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] HHouse Health |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (32-3) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |