NV AB482 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 39.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to programs of career and technical education. (BDR 34-1093)
Title
Revises provisions relating to programs of career and technical education. (BDR 34-1093)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 39. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | To committee. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2017-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |