NY A00055 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - signed chap.29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-24 - signed chap.29
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the interstate compact for juveniles; relates to the appointment of lawyers for children.
Title
Adopts the interstate compact for juveniles; relates to the appointment of lawyers for children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Senate | signed chap.29 |
2011-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-05-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.403 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2551A |
2011-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.287 |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | print number 55a |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02551 (Same As) 2011-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A55A