NY A00055 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - print number 55a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - print number 55a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a biodiesel grant program for the agricultural production of biodiesel fuel; defines biodiesel fuel as a renewable, biodegradable, mono alkyl ester combustible liquid fuel derived from jatropha plants, algae production, mustard seed, animal fats and/or waste greases and oils; establishes the biodiesel grant program fund.
Title
Establishes a biodiesel grant program for the agricultural production of biodiesel fuel; defines biodiesel fuel as a renewable, biodegradable, mono alkyl ester combustible liquid fuel derived from jatropha plants, algae production, mustard seed, animal fats and/or waste greases and oils; establishes the biodiesel grant program fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Assembly | print number 55a |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01182 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
S01182 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 1182A
S01182 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - PRINT NUMBER 1182A