NY A00055 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or offer for sale at retail of bottled water for human consumption, food preparation or culinary purposes in this state in a beverage container unless such container includes on its label certain information; requires an annual bottled water report to be prepared by the purveyors of bottled water.
Title
Prohibits the sale or offer for sale at retail of bottled water for human consumption, food preparation or culinary purposes in this state in a beverage container unless such container includes on its label certain information; requires an annual bottled water report to be prepared by the purveyors of bottled water.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. Margaret Markey [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | print number 55a |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |