NY A00580 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.1119
2019-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S245A
2019-05-29SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.374
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S00245 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A580

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00580&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00580&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00580
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00580&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00580&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00580&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A580#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback