NY A00619 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the lease and landlord fraud public awareness program to promote public awareness of the potential risks of signing a fraudulent lease with an individual misrepresenting themselves as a landlord.
Title
Establishes the lease and landlord fraud public awareness program to promote public awareness of the potential risks of signing a fraudulent lease with an individual misrepresenting themselves as a landlord.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.152 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.152 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | print number 619a |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |