NY A00679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-16 - amend and recommit to rules 679c
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to standing for persons affected by prohibited or unlawful business practices and expands prohibited acts to include unfair, deceptive or abusive acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to standing for persons affected by prohibited or unlawful business practices and expands prohibited acts to include unfair, deceptive or abusive acts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 679c
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-22Assemblyprint number 679b
2019-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-05-20Assemblyprint number 679a
2019-05-20Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02407 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00679
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00679A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00679B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00679C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00679&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback