NY S02407 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to standing for persons affected by prohibited or unlawful business practices and expands prohibited acts to include unfair, deceptive or abusive acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to standing for persons affected by prohibited or unlawful business practices and expands prohibited acts to include unfair, deceptive or abusive acts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2407C
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1093
2019-05-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 2407B
2019-05-20SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-05-08SenatePRINT NUMBER 2407A
2019-05-08SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-01-24SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A00679 (Same As) 2019-06-16 - amend and recommit to rules 679c

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback