NY A00732 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of glyphosate on state property.
Title
Prohibits the use of glyphosate on state property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.70 |
2020-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.378 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.220 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | substituted for a732b |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.797 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6502A |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted by s6502a |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.220 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.220 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | print number 732b |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 732a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00182 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
S06502 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
S06502 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70