NY A00794 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; provides such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Title
Authorizes the state to convey certain forest preserve land; provides such sale shall be subject to legislative approval and the proceeds of such conveyance shall be used for acquisitions to the forest preserve.
Sponsors
Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Asm. Matthew Simpson [R] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 794a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05333 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - referred to environmental conservation