NY A01051 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - signed chap.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - signed chap.24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation; amends chapter 500 of the laws of 2012, amending the civil practice law and rules, the general municipal law, the environmental conservation law, the public authorities law, the education law, the mental hygiene law, the private housing finance law, the facilities development corporation act, the administrative code of the city of New York, and chapter 154 of the laws of 1921 relating to the port authority of New York and New Jersey, relating to establishing a uniform process and requirement for the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation; amends chapter 500 of the laws of 2012, amending the civil practice law and rules, the general municipal law, the environmental conservation law, the public authorities law, the education law, the mental hygiene law, the private housing finance law, the facilities development corporation act, the administrative code of the city of New York, and chapter 154 of the laws of 1921 relating to the port authority of New York and New Jersey, relating to establishing a uniform process and requirement for the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation, in relation to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | signed chap.24 |
2013-04-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-04-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.325 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2155 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.1 |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.1 |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02155 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1051