NY A01489 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that applicants for or recipients of food stamps shall not be subjected to finger imaging as a requirement of the food stamp program.
Title
Provides that applicants for or recipients of food stamps shall not be subjected to finger imaging as a requirement of the food stamp program.
Sponsors
Asm. Keith Wright [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.99 |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to social services |