NY A01606 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Incorporates resource conservation, energy efficiency, green technologies, and alternative and renewable energy measures of project applicants into a uniform tax exemption policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incorporates resource conservation, energy efficiency, green technologies, and alternative and renewable energy measures of project applicants into a uniform tax exemption policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23Senatesigned chap.386
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1610
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5609
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-16Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.328
2019-05-14Assemblyreported
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05609 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1606

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01606&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01606&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01606
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01606&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01606&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01606&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1606#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback