NY A01782 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the tax credit provided for solar energy system equipment from $5000 to $10,000.
Title
Relates to increasing the tax credit provided for solar energy system equipment from $5000 to $10,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | print number 1782a |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01412 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 1412A