NY A01793 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides workers' compensation benefits for injury or sickness, pregnancy or family leave; applies to an employee and to family members taking family leave to care for an employee.
Title
Provides workers' compensation benefits for injury or sickness, pregnancy or family leave; applies to an employee and to family members taking family leave to care for an employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.9 |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.9 |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-02-28 | Assembly | print number 1793b |
2014-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | print number 1793a |
2014-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04742 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4742B