NY A01986 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of aggravated family offense when a person has committed a specified offense and has been convicted of one or more specified offenses within the past five years.
Title
Establishes the crime of aggravated family offense when a person has committed a specified offense and has been convicted of one or more specified offenses within the past five years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.318 |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | committed to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.87 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.172 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.172 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 1986b |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | print number 1986a |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01510 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S05822 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CODES
S05822 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CODES