NY A02022 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.272
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1920
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S383
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.151
2017-05-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.269
2017-05-02Assemblyreported
2017-03-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-17Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00383 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2022

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02022&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02022&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02022
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02022&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02022&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02022&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A2022#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback