NY A02501 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the reduction of mercury in mercury-added lamps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the reduction of mercury in mercury-added lamps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-30Senate3RD READING CAL.75
2019-04-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2139B
2019-04-30SenateRECOMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-04-30Senatereturned to senate
2019-04-30Assemblyrepassed assembly
2019-04-10Assemblyamended on third reading 2501a
2019-04-10Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2019-04-10AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-10Senaterecalled from senate
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-02-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-27Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.61
2019-02-11Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02139 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2501A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02501
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02501A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2501#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback