NY A02632 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s3686b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing reverse cooperative apartment unit loans for persons sixty-two years of age or older; provides additional consumer protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing reverse cooperative apartment unit loans for persons sixty-two years of age or older; provides additional consumer protections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s3686b
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.587
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.587
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-15Assemblyprint number 2632b
2019-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to banks
2019-06-11Assemblyprint number 2632a
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to banks
2019-01-24Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S03686 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02632
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02632A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02632B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02632&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback