NY A02667 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits pre-payment penalties for mortgages secured by real property owned in a cooperative form of ownership where over fifty percent of the units are shareholder occupied.
Title
Prohibits pre-payment penalties for mortgages secured by real property owned in a cooperative form of ownership where over fifty percent of the units are shareholder occupied.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.119 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.233 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03347 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY