NY A02885 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the county health commissioner to notify certain individuals in the event of an emergency creating an imminent risk to public health and safety.
Title
Requires the county health commissioner to notify certain individuals in the event of an emergency creating an imminent risk to public health and safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.391 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03682 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES