NY A03217 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the suspension of hunting and fishing licenses pursuant to the interstate wildlife violator compact.
Title
Relates to the suspension of hunting and fishing licenses pursuant to the interstate wildlife violator compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.496 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1024 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2413 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.72 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.72 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02413 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.496