NY A03235 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.264
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to assessment of the record of performance of banking institutions in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to assessment of the record of performance of banking institutions in helping to meet the credit needs of local communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13Senatesigned chap.264
2019-09-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.898
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3223
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.494
2019-05-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S03223 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3235

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback