NY A03429 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cemetery corporations to post and provide customers with the New York state cemetery disclosure form.
Title
Requires cemetery corporations to post and provide customers with the New York state cemetery disclosure form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.42 |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.336 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.157 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a3429a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.432 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.779 |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4284A |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4284a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.157 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | print number 3429a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04284 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.42